|
03/03/2018
|
Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2017
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2351.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2768.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/20/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1133.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
May 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 744.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2017
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|