California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB11 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2017

Amended

Bill July 5, 2017
Bill May 9, 2017
Bill April 26, 2017
Bill April 17, 2017