Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2018
|
August 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4409.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4305.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4995.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|