California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1182 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2018

Amended

Bill August 6, 2018
Bill May 25, 2018
Bill May 1, 2018
Bill April 26, 2018
Bill April 10, 2018