|
09/28/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 898, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 5. Page 6187.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2018
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 4351.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4306.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
April 30 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2018
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4700.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2018
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|