California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1200 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2018

Amended

Bill August 20, 2018
Bill August 6, 2018
Bill March 21, 2018