|
09/17/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 463, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5263.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6217.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4331.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4997.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
May 1 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2018
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|