California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1244 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 15, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 17, 2018

Amended

Bill July 5, 2018
Bill May 15, 2018
Bill April 30, 2018
Bill March 21, 2018