|
09/19/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 565, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5691.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6516.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4337.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4885.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2018
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4746.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|