California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1248 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2018

Amended

Bill June 12, 2018
Bill April 30, 2018
Bill April 2, 2018