|
09/28/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 899, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6173.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (August 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 9. Page 4409.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4307.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4815.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|