California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1249 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2018

Amended

Bill August 28, 2018
Bill August 6, 2018
Bill July 2, 2018
Bill April 30, 2018
Bill April 3, 2018