|
07/20/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 156, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
07/20/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6109.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4879.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2018
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 4606.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|