|
09/28/2018
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2018
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5870.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6598.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4314.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4308.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2018
|
May 14 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
May 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2018
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
April 30 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2018
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4720.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4698.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2018
|
Set for hearing April 18 in EQ. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2018
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|