California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1301 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2018

Amended

Bill August 6, 2018
Bill June 19, 2018
Bill May 25, 2018
Bill May 17, 2018
Bill April 9, 2018