|
09/14/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 420, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 6404.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4879.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4717.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2018
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4626.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2018
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2018
|
April 11 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|