California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1428 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2018

Amended

Bill April 25, 2018
Bill April 4, 2018