|
09/30/2018
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2018
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6129.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6967.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4393.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4311.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2018
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2018
|
April 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4516.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2018
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|