California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1449 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2018

Amended

Bill August 23, 2018
Bill May 25, 2018
Bill March 22, 2018