|
10/03/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 456, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2992.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 3413.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (September 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (August 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2017
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2017
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2227.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2183.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2017
|
Set for hearing August 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 2004.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
Set for hearing July 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1751.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|