California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB159 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2017

Amended

Bill September 7, 2017
Bill June 15, 2017