Assembly | 06/29/2017 | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member McCarty. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2017 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 38. Noes 24. Page 2408.) | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 13). | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2017 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2017 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2017 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 703.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 538.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Set for hearing March 28. | ||
Senate | 01/19/2017 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. | ||
Senate | 12/06/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. | ||
Senate | 12/05/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |