|
09/29/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 367, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 2959.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 3418.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 2826.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 1384.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 884.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 327.) (March 7). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2017
|
Set for hearing March 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|