California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB166 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2017

Amended

Bill July 3, 2017
Bill May 2, 2017
Bill April 19, 2017
Bill March 1, 2017