|
10/09/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 603, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 2837.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 9. Page 3167.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/20/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1262.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1176.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 807.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2017
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|