California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB17 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2017

Amended

Bill September 5, 2017
Bill July 20, 2017
Bill July 5, 2017
Bill April 25, 2017
Bill March 14, 2017