|
10/09/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 621, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2477.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2840.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 642.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 539.) (March 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 444.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|