|
10/13/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 770, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2017
|
(Corrected September 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2904.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3156.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/18/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1134.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 853.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2017
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|