California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB189 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2017

Amended

Bill September 7, 2017
Bill August 21, 2017
Bill July 18, 2017
Bill July 10, 2017
Bill April 5, 2017