|
09/10/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 328, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5419.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6309.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
July 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 2. Page 1265.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1179.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 624.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|