California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB192 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 10, 2018

Amended

Bill August 6, 2018
Bill June 12, 2018
Bill April 18, 2017
Bill March 28, 2017