|
09/26/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 306, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 6. Page 2788.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 10. Page 3148.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2017
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 800.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 708.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
April 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2017
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 364.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2017
|
Set for hearing March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2017
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|