California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB214 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2017

Amended

Bill September 5, 2017
Bill April 6, 2017