|
09/28/2018
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2018
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 6020.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 6013.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5880.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 31. Page 6583.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2018
|
June 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4115.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4006.) (January 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2018
|
Set for hearing January 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/21/2017
|
Set for hearing January 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2017
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|