|
10/05/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 512, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 2993.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 7. Page 3399.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/18/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (July 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 1133.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Published May 16 at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1020.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 929.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|