California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB235 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2017

Amended

Bill September 8, 2017
Bill June 29, 2017
Bill May 16, 2017
Bill March 28, 2017