|
10/05/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 514, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2994.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3403.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2017
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2017
|
June 26 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2017
|
June 19 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
June 5 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 766.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 619.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2017
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|