California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB266 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2017

Amended

Bill September 7, 2017
Bill July 5, 2017