|
09/20/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 601, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5685.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 5619.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Set for hearing August 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5450.) Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6309.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2017
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 1347.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1180.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
April 3 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2017
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 364.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2017
|
Set for hearing March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|