California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB269 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2018

Amended

Bill August 6, 2018
Bill June 19, 2018