|
07/24/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2472.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2017
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 905.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
Published April 26 at 4 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 726.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
April 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2017
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|