California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB315 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2017

Enrolled

Bill July 10, 2017

Chaptered

Bill July 24, 2017

Amended

Bill April 25, 2017
Bill March 16, 2017