|
09/30/2018
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2018
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 6022.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 6760.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2018
|
August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2018
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 4111.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4055.) (January 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2018
|
Set for hearing January 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2018
|
January 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2018
|
Set for hearing January 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 4019.) (January 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/21/2017
|
Set for hearing January 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 807.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2017
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|