LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2017-2018 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB320
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB320
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2017-2018 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB320
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 13, 2017
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 5, 2018
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 24, 2018
Compare
Bill
August 20, 2018
Compare
Bill
June 14, 2018
Compare
Bill
June 4, 2018
Compare
Bill
January 11, 2018
Compare
Bill
January 3, 2018
Compare
Bill
April 25, 2017
Compare
Bill
March 16, 2017
Compare