|
10/12/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 727, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2859.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2017
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3034.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/20/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1260.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Set for hearing May 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
May 15 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Set for hearing May 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2017
|
May 1 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2017
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 750.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|