California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB329 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2017

Amended

Bill June 29, 2017
Bill May 17, 2017