|
09/14/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 402, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5687.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6483.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
June 27 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2017
|
July 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1270.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1184.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Set for hearing May 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2017
|
May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2017
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 625.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|