California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB398 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2017

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2018

Amended

Bill March 23, 2018
Bill April 6, 2017