|
09/30/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1006, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 6125.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 32. Page 6969.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2018
|
June 27 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2018
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2017
|
June 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2017
|
June 13 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2017
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 1063.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2017
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 599.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2017
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2017
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|