California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB439 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2018

Amended

Bill August 20, 2018
Bill June 6, 2018
Bill March 28, 2017